EP1384751 - Container formed from multimodal ethylene polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLVAY POLYOLEFINS EUROPE - BELGIUM (Société Anonyme) rue du Prince Albert, 44 1050 Bruxelles / BE | [2004/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorgerin, Michel Rue d'Ecaussinnes 2 7062 Soignies / BE | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al BP International Limited Patents & Agreements Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al BP International Limited, Group Patents & Agreements, Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 02078183.7 | 25.07.2002 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1384751 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/06, C08L23/04, B65D1/00 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/43] |
Former [2004/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Behälter aus multimodalen Ethylenpolmeren | [2004/05] | English: | Container formed from multimodal ethylene polymer | [2004/05] | French: | Récipient en polymère éthylène multimodal | [2004/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 12.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5380803 (COUTANT WILLIAM R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15,17 * abstract * * column 2, line 6 * * column 4; table 1 * * column 5, lines 10-35; table 2 * * column 6; table 3 *; | [X]WO0071615 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-9,12,15 * abstract * * page 2, lines 1-22 * * page 3, lines 1-15 * * page 4, lines 1-3,13-35 * * page 6, lines 11-40 * * page 7, line 6 * * page 11; table 1 ** page 12; table 2 *; | [DX]US6194520 (CHERUVU SUBRAHMANYAM [US], et al) [DX] 1-7,9-14,16,17 * abstract * * column 3, line 2 * * column 4, lines 11-50 * * column 14, lines 15-40 * |