EP1285578 - Transgenic animal model of Alzheimer's disease [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2007/44] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geppert, Martin, c/o GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 02 /
Harper, Alexander James, c/o GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 03 /
Harrison, Steve Mark, c/o GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 04 /
Prosser, Hayon, c/o GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Giddings, Peter John GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Giddings, Peter John, Dr. GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02078428.6 | 20.08.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | GB20010020342 | 21.08.2001 Original published format: GB 0120342 | GB20010026723 | 07.11.2001 Original published format: GB 0126723 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1285578 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1285578 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1285578 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C12N15/57, C12N15/85, C12N15/89, C12Q1/37, G01N33/50, C07K14/47 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
C07K14/4711 (EP,US);
C12N9/6478 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0312 (EP,US);
C12N2830/008 (EP,US);
C12N2830/85 (EP,US);
C12N2840/203 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/09] | A01K67/027, C12N15/57, C12N15/85, C12N15/89, C12Q1/37, G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/09] | Title | German: | Transgenes Tiermodell für Alzheimer-Erkrankung | [2003/09] | English: | Transgenic animal model of Alzheimer's disease | [2003/09] | French: | Modèle animal transgénique pour la maladie d'Alzheimer | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 08.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.2007 | CH | 31.10.2007 | CY | 31.10.2007 | CZ | 31.10.2007 | DK | 31.10.2007 | EE | 31.10.2007 | FI | 31.10.2007 | LI | 31.10.2007 | NL | 31.10.2007 | SK | 31.10.2007 | TR | 31.10.2007 | BG | 31.01.2008 | SE | 31.01.2008 | GR | 01.02.2008 | PT | 31.03.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CY | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 31.10.2007 | |
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 31.10.2007 | |
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - HARPER A J ET AL, "Mouse models for AD;characterisation of beta-secretase (Asp2) overexpressing mice using a novel gene expression strategy.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, 31st Annual Meeting of the Society for Neuroscience;San Diego, California, USA; November 10-15, 2001, (2001), vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 0190-5295, page 852, XP009013867 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | [Y] - HERNANDEZ-SANCHEZ CATALINA ET AL, "Mice transgenically overexpressing sulfonylurea receptor 1 in forebrain resist seizure induction and excitotoxic neuron death.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, March 13, 2001, (20010313), vol. 98, no. 6, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3549 - 3554, XP002247671 [Y] 1-13 * page 3553, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 3554, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.051012898 | [YD] - TANG Y-P ET AL, "Genetic enhancement of learning and memory in mice", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19990902), vol. 401, no. 6748, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 63 - 69, XP002199188 [YD] 1-13 * page 62, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/43432 | [A] - SKOVRONSKY D M ET AL, "beta-Secretase revealed: starting gate for race to novel therapies for Alzheimer's disease", TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER TRENDS JOURNAL, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (200005), vol. 21, no. 5, ISSN 0165-6147, pages 161 - 163, XP004198178 [A] * page 162, column 2, paragraph 3 - column 3, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-6147(00)01467-X | [A] - JANUS C ET AL, "TRANSGENIC MOUSE MODELS OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000726), vol. 1502, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 63 - 75, XP001018988 | [DA] - HUSSAIN I ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF A NOVEL ASPARTIC PROTEASE (ASP 2) AS SS-SECRETASE", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR NEUROSCIENCES, SAN DIEGO, US, (1999), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 1044-7431, pages 419 - 427, XP000908710 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcne.1999.0811 | Examination | WO0047618 |