EP1271701 - Female terminal fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oka, Hiroyuki, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd 1-14 Nishisuhiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP | 02 /
Okamura, Kenji, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd 1-14 Nishisuhiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP | 03 /
Wada, Yoshimasa, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd 1-14 Nishisuhiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02078721.4 | 18.07.1997 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | JP19960197945 | 26.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19794596 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271701 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271701 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/11 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H01R13/113 (EP,US);
H01R13/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2003/39] |
Former [2003/01] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT | Title | German: | Kontaktbüchsenarmatur | [2003/01] | English: | Female terminal fitting | [2003/01] | French: | Armature de borne femelle | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 19.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97305390.3 / EP0821436 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3231484 (LABINAL [FR]) [X] 1,2 * page 11, line 4 - line 13; figures 7,10,11 * [A] 3,4,6,7; | [A]EP0652605 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 3-5,8,9* figure 10 * |