EP1300207 - A method of making a synchronous reluctance machine and powder metal rotor assembly therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/15] | Manufacturing method and composite powder metal rotor assembly for synchronous reluctance machine | ||
[2007/47] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2003/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reiter, Frederick B., Jr. 1010 Morse Landing Drive Cicero, IN 46034 / US | 02 /
Stuart, Tom L. 1872 W. Huntsville Road Pendleton, IN 46064 / US | 03 /
Clase, Scott M. 920 Lake Road Medina, OH 44256 / US | 04 /
Beard, Bradley D. 8212 W.Butternut Road Muncie, IN 47304 / US | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Denton, Michael John Delphi Automotive Systems, Centre Technique Paris, 117, avenue des Nations, B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02078722.2 | 10.09.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | US20010970230 | 03.10.2001 Original published format: US 970230 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300207 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300207 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B22F7/06, H02K15/02 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
H02K1/246 (EP,US);
B22F7/06 (EP,US);
B22F7/08 (EP,US);
H02K15/02 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49009 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49011 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49012 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49075 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49076 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F3/004, B22F3/02, B22F3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/27] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für eine Synchron-Reluktanzmaschine und Verbundrotoranordnung aus Metallpulver für eine solche Maschine | [2007/47] | English: | A method of making a synchronous reluctance machine and powder metal rotor assembly therefor | [2007/47] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une machine électrique synchrone à réluctance et rotor composite en poudre métallique pour une telle machine | [2007/47] |
Former [2003/15] | Herstellungsverfahren und Verbundrotoranordnung aus Metallpulver für Synchron-Reluktanzmaschine | ||
Former [2003/15] | Manufacturing method and composite powder metal rotor assembly for synchronous reluctance machine | ||
Former [2003/15] | Procédé de préparation et rotor composite en poudre métallique pour machine électrique synchrone à réluctance | Examination procedure | 02.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/38] | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08340666 ; | [A]JPH0993886 ; | [A]JPH09117084 ; | [A]EP0483423 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5,14-16,36 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 20 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08340666 A 19961224 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1-62 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09093886 A 19970404 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 36-48 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09117084 A 19970502 (TOSHIBA MACH CO LTD) [A] 1,14,36 * abstract * |