EP1297744 - A method of separating milk from dairy animals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/14] | A device for separating milk from dairy animals | ||
[2004/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lely Enterprises AG Bützenweg 20 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Lely Enterprises AG Bützenweg 20 6300 ZUG / CH | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Lely Enterprises AG 20 Bützenweg 6300 ZUG / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vijverberg, Helena Geralda Maria 32, Hobbemastraat 3141 GH Maassluis / NL | 02 /
Espada Aventin, Elena 5, Crommelinlaan 2627 AD Delft / NL | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 02078836.0 | 18.09.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | NL20011019059 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: NL 1019059 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1297744 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1297744 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1297744 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/007, A01J5/013 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
G01N21/31 (EP,US);
A01J5/007 (EP,US);
A01J5/01 (EP,US);
A01J5/0131 (EP,US);
A01J5/0133 (EP,US);
A01J5/0136 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL, SE [2004/26] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Milchauswahl eines milchgebenden Tieres | [2004/42] | English: | A method of separating milk from dairy animals | [2004/42] | French: | Méthode pour sélectionner le lait d'un animal laitier | [2004/42] |
Former [2003/14] | Vorrichtung zur Milchauswahl eines milchgebenden Tieres | ||
Former [2003/14] | A device for separating milk from dairy animals | ||
Former [2003/14] | Dispositif pour sélectionner le lait d'un animal laitier | Examination procedure | 25.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 02.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SK, TR | 08.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9747187 (ALFA LAVAL AGRI AB [SE], et al) [Y] 13-15* page 2, line 17 - page 7, line 32; figures 1,2; claims 1-13 *; | [XY]WO9931965 (ALFA LAVAL AGRI AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-5,11,12,17,18 * page 4, line 3 - page 6, line 9 * [Y] 6; | [XY]EP1000535 (MAASLAND NV [NL]) [X] 1-4,7-11,16-21 * column 1, line 41 - column 6, line 51; figure 1 * [Y] 6,13-15 | Examination | US5302903 | WO0019807 | by applicant | EP1000535 |