EP1302379 - Dynamic side to side brake proportioning for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2003/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hac, Aleksander Boguslaw 335 Beverly Place Dayton, OH 45419 / US | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Denton, Michael John Delphi Automotive Systems, Centre Technique Paris, 117, avenue des Nations, B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02078933.5 | 23.09.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | US20010977117 | 12.10.2001 Original published format: US 977117 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1302379 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1302379 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1302379 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
B62D6/003 (EP,US);
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60T8/246 (EP,US);
B62D7/159 (EP,US);
B60T2201/16 (EP,US);
B60T2260/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/27] |
Former [2003/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Links/rechts- dynamische Bremskraftverteilung für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2003/16] | English: | Dynamic side to side brake proportioning for motor vehicle | [2003/16] | French: | Répartition de la force de freinage entre les roues droites et gauches d'un véhicule automobile | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.02.2008 | GB | 23.09.2008 | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/39] | IT | 13.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4666013 (SHIBAHATA YASUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 19,20* figure 17 *; | [X]US5172961 (INOUE HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-14 * abstract *; | [Y]DE4419131 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 3,4,9,10,15,16 * claim 1 *; | [XY]DE10101197 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-14 * column 4, line 8 - line 16 * * claim 1 * [Y] 3,4,9,10,15,16,19,20 |