EP1402922 - Device for radiation treatment of proliferative tissue surrounding a cavity in an animal body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nucletron B.V. Waardgelder 1 3905 TH Veenendaal / NL | [2004/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linares, Luis A. 514 Dorrington Blvd Metairie, LA-70005 / US | 02 /
Kindlein, Johann Liricherstrasse 153F D-46049 Oberhausen / DE | [2007/06] |
Former [2004/14] | 01 /
Linares, Luis A. 514 Dorrington Blvd Matairie, LA-70005 / US | ||
02 /
Kindlein, Johann Liricherstrasse 153F D-46049 Oberhausen / DE | Representative(s) | Valkonet, Rutger Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Valkonet, Rutger Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/14] | Valkonet, Rutger Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02079066.3 | 27.09.2002 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1402922 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1402922 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
A61N5/1015 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/14] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Strahlenbehandlung von proliferativem Gewebe grenzend an eine Körperhöhle | [2004/14] | English: | Device for radiation treatment of proliferative tissue surrounding a cavity in an animal body | [2004/14] | French: | Dispositif d'irradiation de tissu proliférant entourant une cavité corporelle | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 21.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2007 | CH | 07.02.2007 | CY | 07.02.2007 | CZ | 07.02.2007 | DK | 07.02.2007 | EE | 07.02.2007 | FI | 07.02.2007 | LI | 07.02.2007 | SK | 07.02.2007 | TR | 07.02.2007 | SE | 07.05.2007 | BG | 08.05.2007 | GR | 08.05.2007 | PT | 09.07.2007 | IE | 27.09.2007 | LU | 27.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
CY | 07.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
EE | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
SK | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
IE | 27.09.2007 | ||
LU | 27.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
CY | 07.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
EE | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
SK | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
IE | 27.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
EE | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
SK | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
IE | 27.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
SK | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
IE | 27.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
SK | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
SK | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
GR | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
SK | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
SK | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
PT | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 07.02.2007 | |
CH | 07.02.2007 | ||
DK | 07.02.2007 | ||
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 07.02.2007 | |
FI | 07.02.2007 | ||
LI | 07.02.2007 | ||
SE | 07.05.2007 | ||
BG | 08.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3872856 (CLAYTON RALPH S) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]EP0719571 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8,11-20 * column 18, line 41 - line 56 * * column 36, line 1 - line 15 * * column 42, line 25 - column 43, line 58 * * column 49, line 33 - column 50, line 34; figures 49-65 *; | [XAY]US5653683 (D ANDREA MARK A [US]) [X] 1-3,7,8,11-20 * column 4, line 34 - line 37 * * column 5, line 38 - line 44 * * column 6, line 22 - line 23 * [A] 4 [Y] 9; | [A]WO9801183 (OPTISCHE IND DE OUDE DELFT NV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]US5938582 (CIAMACCO JR SAM [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 6; figures 1-3 *; | [DY]US6413204 (WINKLER RANCE A [US], et al) [DY] 9 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 12; figure 3 * | by applicant | US5492582 | US5913813 | US6413204 |