EP1280064 - Communication control method and apparatus, and communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/30] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isoda, Takashi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shimura, Akihiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/05] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02079458.2 | 04.09.1998 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | JP19970244430 | 09.09.1997 Original published format: JP 24443097 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1280064 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1280064 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1280064 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/12 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
H04L12/40123 (EP,KR,US);
G06F13/12 (KR);
G06F13/126 (EP,US);
G06F3/1201 (KR);
G06F3/1211 (EP,US);
G06F3/1236 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/05] | Title | German: | Kommunikationssteuerverfahren und Vorrichtung und Kommunikationssystem | [2003/05] | English: | Communication control method and apparatus, and communication system | [2003/05] | French: | Procédé de commande de communication et appareil, et système de communication | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98307152.3 / EP0902371 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 05.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 23.07.2008 | [2009/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0560343 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 6, line 40 - column 8, line 5; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5611056 (HOTCHKIN GLENN T [US]) [A] 1-11* column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 5; figures 2,3 *; | [A] - ANSI, "Information Technology-Serial Bus Protocol 2 (SBP-2)", ANSI STANDARD X3T10, WORKING DRAFT, OAKLAND, CA, US, (19960717), pages 61 - 64, URL: ftp://ftp.t10.org/t10/drafts/sbp2/sbp2r01.pdf, (20040823), XP002293897 [A] 1-11 * page 61, paragraph 1 * * page 64 * |