EP1308895 - Superimposing graphic representations of ground locations onto ground location images after dectection of failures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc. 1105 North Market Street Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC. 1105 North Market Street Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | ||
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paz-Pujalt, Gustavo Roberto, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Spoonhower, John Philip, c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Parkes, David Alan, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Dreiss, Uwe, et al DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Dreiss, Uwe, et al Patentanwälte Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2003/37] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/19] | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02079463.2 | 18.10.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | US20010020745 | 30.10.2001 Original published format: US 20745 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308895 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308895 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
G06T7/254 (EP,US);
G06V20/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/19] | Title | German: | Überlagerung von graphischen Grundlagenabbildungen auf Grundlagenbilder nach Fehlererkennung | [2003/19] | English: | Superimposing graphic representations of ground locations onto ground location images after dectection of failures | [2003/19] | French: | Superposition de representations graphiques d'emplacements terrestres sur des images d'emplacements terrestres après détection de défauts | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/24] | 30.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5815411 (ELLENBY JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X]EP0989353 (PIPELINE INTEGRITY INT LTD [US]) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]US6094625 (RALSTON STUART E [NZ]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [X] - BERMAN M ET AL, "Image Analysis Activities - Corridor Mapping using Stereo Vision - Powerline Inspection", COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION, WWW.CSIRO.AU, (200109), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.cmis.csiro.au/iap/RecentProjects/corridormap.htm, (20060508), XP007900629 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - WHITWORTH C C ET AL, "Aerial video inspection of overhead power lines", POWER ENGINEERING JOURNAL IEE UK, (200102), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 0950-3366, pages 25 - 32, XP008063480 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/pe:20010103 | [X] - JANG B ET AL, "AN OUTDOOR AUGMENTED REALITY SYSTEM FOR GIS APPLICATIONS", MIXED REALITY. MERGING REAL AND VIRTUAL WORLDS. PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MIX REALITY. MERGING REAL AND VIRTUAL WORLDS, (1993), pages 391 - 399, XP001118693 [X] 1-10 * section 22.3, figure 22.1 * * section 22.4.2, figure 22.7 * | [A] - MCGARIGLE B, "Digital Aerial Photography Flies", GOVERNMENT TECHNOLOGY, HTTP://WWW.GOVTECH.NET, (19970301), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.govtech.net/magazine/story.php?id=95283&issue=3:1997, (20060424), XP007900548 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - RONALD T AZUMA, "A Survey of Augmented Reality", PRESENCE, CAMBRIDGE, MA, US, (199708), ISSN 1054-7460, pages 1 - 48, XP002254668 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |