EP1309138 - Primary station for use in a multiple access telecommunication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/39] |
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Driel, Carel Jan Leendert Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstl. 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Van Grinsven, Petrus Augustinus Maria Internationaal Octrooibureau BV Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2016/27] |
Former [2003/19] | 01 /
Driel, Carel Jan Leendert Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstl. 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
Van Grinsven, Petrus Augustinus Maria Internationaal Octrooibureau BV, Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2016/27] |
Former [2010/49] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/19] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02079531.6 | 18.10.1996 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | EP19950202853 | 23.10.1995 Original published format: EP 95202853 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1309138 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1309138 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1309138 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1309138 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
H04J3/1694 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04H20/78 (KR);
H04L12/2801 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/403 (EP,US);
H04L12/4035 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/2612 (KR);
H04L2012/561 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2012/5615 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5616 (EP,US);
H04L2012/563 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2012/5632 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5634 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5672 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5676 (EP,US);
H04L41/00 (US);
H04Q11/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/19] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/27] |
Former [2003/19] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Primäre Station für den Gebrauch in einem Übertragungsnetz mit Vielfachzugriff | [2003/19] | English: | Primary station for use in a multiple access telecommunication network | [2003/19] | French: | Station primaire pour utilisation dans un réseau de transmission à acces multiple | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 15.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96932768.3 / EP0799533 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2010
18.08.2010
WITHDRAWN SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2010
18.08.2010
WITHDRAWN SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2010
WITHDRAWN SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 08.06.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.10.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.02.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.05.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 08.06.2012 | Appeal received No. T1300/12 | 10.10.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.04.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.07.2009 | [2011/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4742512 (AKASHI FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 8, line 64 - column 9, line 33 ** claim 1 *; | [X]EP0321454 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 13 * * column 5, line 46 - line 60 * * column 7, line 12 - line 16 *; | [X]US5297144 (GILBERT SHELDON L [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, line 55 - line 59 * * column 3, line 26 - line 51 * * column 11, line 6 - line 35 * * claim 1 * |