EP1418743 - System for billing rating and selection of accounts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CMG IPR Telecommunications B.V. Merweplein 5 3432 GN Nieuwegein / NL | [2004/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'Regan, Michael 27 Dun Eoin Carrigaline, Co. Cork / IE | 02 /
Deakin, Ian Cornody Coachford, Co. Cork / IE | 03 /
Mullins, Robert 12 Beechwood Close Silverprings, Clonmel, Co. Tipperary / IE | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 02079659.5 | 07.11.2002 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1418743 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/00, H04M17/00, H04L12/14 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H04M15/70 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/1403 (EP,US);
H04L12/1432 (EP,US);
H04L12/1457 (EP,US);
H04L12/1467 (EP,US);
H04L12/1482 (EP,US);
H04L12/1485 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/41 (EP,US);
H04M15/43 (EP,US);
H04M15/56 (EP,US);
H04M15/57 (EP,US);
H04M15/73 (EP,US);
H04M15/74 (EP,US);
H04M15/745 (EP,US);
H04M15/7655 (EP,US);
H04M15/77 (EP,US);
H04M15/772 (EP,US);
H04M15/80 (EP,US);
H04M15/8214 (EP,US);
H04M15/83 (EP,US);
H04M15/854 (EP,US);
H04M15/88 (EP,US);
H04M17/00 (EP,US);
H04M17/20 (EP,US);
H04M17/201 (EP,US);
H04M7/0036 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04M2017/22 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0108 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0116 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0152 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0164 (EP,US);
H04M2215/018 (EP,US);
H04M2215/2013 (EP,US);
H04M2215/202 (EP,US);
H04M2215/2026 (EP,US);
H04M2215/204 (EP,US);
H04M2215/208 (EP,US);
H04M2215/22 (EP,US);
H04M2215/28 (EP,US);
H04M2215/32 (EP,US);
H04M2215/70 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7072 (EP,US);
H04M2215/709 (EP,US);
H04M2215/725 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7254 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7263 (EP,US);
H04M2215/782 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/05] |
Former [2004/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Gebührenberechnung und Auswahl von Konten | [2004/20] | English: | System for billing rating and selection of accounts | [2004/20] | French: | Système pour facturation et sélection de comptes | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/34] | 10.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.12.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9856202 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 30 ** page 7, line 22 - page 10, line 3 *; | [A]WO9960801 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * page 3, line 8 - line 21 * * page 4, line 28 - line 31 * * page 7, line 4 - line 26 *; | [XY]WO0158110 (APION TELECOMS LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1,9,12 * abstract * * page 1, line 7 - line 11 * * page 2, line 1 - line 30 * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 30 * * page 5, line 9 - page 8, line 10 * * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 2 * * page 13, line 11 - line 30 * [Y] 2-8,10,11; | [A]WO0160045 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * page 4, line 24 - line 34 * * page 11, line 15 - line 26 *; | [DY]WO0163883 (TELECOMM SYSTEMS INC [US]) [DY] 2-8,10,11 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - line 14 * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 5 * * page 3, line 17 - line 23 * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 8 * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 24 * * page 7, line 19 - line 21 * * page 9, line 3 - line 22 * * page 10, line 8 - line 30; figures 1,4 * |