EP1424671 - Illuminated sign [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alrec Sign & Display B.V. Ondernemingsweg 11 3641 RZ Mijdrecht / NL | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caarls, Ronald Adrianus Lieoever 64 2033 AD Haarlem / NL | 02 /
Van Der Plaat, Peter Scholeksterlaan 39 3645 KA Vinkeveen / NL | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Arnt Reinier De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Aalbers, Arnt Reinier De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 02080018.1 | 29.11.2002 | [2004/23] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424671 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G09F13/20, G09F13/26, G09F13/04 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
G09F13/26 (EP,US);
G09F13/04 (EP,US);
G09F13/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Title | German: | Leuchtanzeigevorrichtung | [2004/23] | English: | Illuminated sign | [2004/23] | French: | Enseigne lumineuse | [2004/23] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 28.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002286941 ; | [X]JP2000347605 ; | [XY]US3968584 (KINGSTON WILLARD L) [X] 1,7-9,11 * column 2, line 33 - line 53 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-6,10; | [X]EP0187410 (GLOBETECH LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4,10 * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 34 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US5536558 (SHELTON K DAVID [US]) [Y] 2-6,10 * column 9, line 20 - line 37 * * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 32 * * column 12, line 56 - line 62 * * figures 1,3-15 *; | [A]DE19818887 (HES JAN [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6234656 (HOSSEINI ABBAS [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 9, line 17 - line 36 ** figures 1,13 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030205), vol. 2003, no. 02, & JP2002286941 A 20021003 (HARISON TOSHIBA LIGHTING CORP) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000347605 A 20001215 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENGINEERING CO LTD;MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * |