EP1327994 - Flexible electrical lead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grögl, Ferdinand Mittlere Kreuzgasse 11 90403 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Mann, Thomas Waldstrasse 1 91367 Weissenohe / DE | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Döring, Roger Patentanwalt Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Weidenkamp 2 30855 Langenhagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02080291.4 | 13.12.2002 | [2003/29] | Priority number, date | DE2001162739 | 20.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10162739 | [2003/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1327994 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1327994 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01B9/00 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
H01B9/003 (EP,US);
H01B11/1091 (EP,US);
H01B3/441 (EP,US);
H01B7/041 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/29] | H01B3/44, H01B3/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/29] | Title | German: | Flexible elektrische Leitung | [2003/29] | English: | Flexible electrical lead | [2003/29] | French: | Câble électrique flexible | [2003/29] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 08.10.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1041585 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 43 - column 5, line 29; figures 1-5 *[A] 3-14 |