EP1295583 - Integrated siderail and accessory rail for a bed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006 / US | [2005/12] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states HILL-ROM, INC. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, Indiana 47006-9167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corbin, Scott M. 850 Eastern Avenue Sunman, Indiana 47041 / US | 02 /
Moster, Jeffrey A. 572 Covedale Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45238 / US | 03 /
Wilson, Robert W. 27 White Oak Drive Batesville, Indiana 47006 / US | 04 /
Miller, John D. 2171 Morgan Road Brookville, Indiana 47012 / US | 05 /
Webster, Thomas Matthew 8893 Harrison Pike Cleves, Ohio 45002 / US | 06 /
Walke, James L. 222 North Depot Street Batesville, Indiana 47006 / US | 07 /
Howell, Charles A. 106 White Oak Drive Batesville, Indiana 47006 / US | [2003/27] |
Former [2003/13] | 01 /
Corbin, Scott M. 9570 E. North Dearborn Road Sunman, Indiana 47041 / US | ||
02 /
Moster, Jeffrey A. 572 Covedale Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45238 / US | |||
03 /
Wilson, Robert W. 27 White Oak Drive Batesville, Indiana 47006 / US | |||
04 /
Miller, John D. 2171 Morgan Road Brookville, Indiana 47012 / US | |||
05 /
Webster, Thomas Matthew 8186 West Mill Street, Apt. 249 Cleves, Ohio 46002 / US | |||
06 /
Walke, James L. 222 North Depot Street Batesville, Indiana 47006 / US | |||
07 /
Howell, Charles A. 106 White Oak Drive Batesville, Indiana 47006 / US | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02080558.6 | 20.10.1997 | [2003/13] | Priority number, date | US19960735510 | 23.10.1996 Original published format: US 735510 | US19960747318 | 12.11.1996 Original published format: US 747318 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1295583 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1295583 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1295583 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/05, A47C21/08 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
A61G7/0507 (EP);
A61G7/05 (EP);
A61G7/0509 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2003/13] | Title | German: | Integriertes Seitengitter und Zubehörtragevorrichtung für ein Bett | [2003/13] | English: | Integrated siderail and accessory rail for a bed | [2003/13] | French: | Barreau latéral intégré et barre à accessoires pour lit | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 17.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97911888.2 / EP0971614 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.04.2005 | CH | 20.04.2005 | IT | 20.04.2005 | LI | 20.04.2005 | NL | 20.04.2005 | [2007/38] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.04.2005 | |
CH | 20.04.2005 | ||
LI | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.04.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2976548 (MAERTINS GUSTAVE R) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 71 - column 2, line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3021534 (HAUSTED RAY K) [A] 1-13* column 2, line 30 - line 59; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US3351961 (DANIELS WILLIAM A, et al) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 50; figures 1,7,8 *; | [A]GB1094692 (LLEWELLYN & COMPANY LTD F) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 10 - line 58; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | US2722017 | US5129117 | US5522100 |