Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1333158 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1333158



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 96
26.05.2009 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.06.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.06.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.06.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
02.06.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.06.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
02.06.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.03.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
28.03.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
28.03.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.03.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
30.03.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
22.03.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
17.03.2006 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
13.12.2005 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
13.12.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
13.12.2005 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.12.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
30.09.2005 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
30.09.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
06.12.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
30.11.2004 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
30.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
30.11.2004 Description Search / examination 2
30.11.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.11.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
30.11.2004 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 5
30.11.2004 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
05.10.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.09.2004 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
29.09.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.09.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.05.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
28.05.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.08.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.06.2003 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.07.2002 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
15.07.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
15.07.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.07.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
26.03.2002 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.01.2002 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
30.01.2002 Claims Search / examination 3
30.01.2002 Description Search / examination 8
30.01.2002 Drawings Search / examination 1
30.01.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3