Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
13.06.2008 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
12.06.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
12.06.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
19.03.2008 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
08.02.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.02.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.03.2006 | Change - applicant | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] |
09.02.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.12.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
28.09.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.02.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.12.2004 | Change - applicant | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] |
01.12.2004 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
01.10.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.07.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
06.07.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
28.05.2004 | First examination report | |
24.05.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
12.03.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] |
20.02.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] |
13.02.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.06.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] |