blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1333158

EP1333158 - Four stroke engine with direct injection and valve driving method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.05.2009
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, LLC
Fairlane Plaza South
Suite 800
330 Town Center Drive
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, LLC
Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
Former [2006/20]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, LLC.
Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive
Dearborn MI 48126 / US
Former [2005/03]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, LLC
One Parklane Blvd 600 Parklane Towers East
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
Former [2003/32]For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, Inc., A subsidiary of Ford Motor Company
600 Parklane Towers East
Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kramer, Ulrich
Rosenstr. 18
51427, Bergisch-Gladbach / DE
 [2003/32]
Representative(s)Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al
Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Patentabteilung NH/DRP
Henry-Ford-Strasse 1
50725 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/32]Drömer, Hans-Carsten, Dr.-Ing., et al
Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1
50725 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date02100080.730.01.2002
[2003/32]
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1333158
Date:06.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1333158
Date:16.07.2008
Language:DE
[2008/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.07.2002
ClassificationIPC:F01L1/34, F02D13/02
[2003/32]
CPC:
F02D13/0215 (EP,US); F01L1/34 (EP,US); F02D13/0219 (EP,US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US); F02D41/006 (EP,US); F02M26/01 (EP,US);
F02B17/005 (EP,US); F02B2075/027 (EP,US); F02B2075/125 (EP,US);
F02D13/0261 (EP,US); F02D13/0269 (EP,US); F02D2013/005 (EP,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US); F02D41/0047 (EP,US); Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/18]
Former [2003/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Viertakt-Ottomotor mit Direkteinspritzung und Verfahren zur Ventilsteuerung[2003/32]
English:Four stroke engine with direct injection and valve driving method[2003/32]
French:Moteur à quatre temps à injection directe et procédé de commande des soupapes[2003/32]
Examination procedure06.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/15]
28.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
13.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2008Fee for grant paid
02.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0854280  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 13-17 * * column 6, line 41 - column 7, line 14 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US5870993  (STELLET HANS-PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 13-27 ** figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US6105550  (NIEBERDING ROLF-GUENTHER [FR]) [A] 1,8 * column 1, lines 7-15 * * column 4, line 14 - column 6, line 6 *
by applicantDE19948298
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.