EP1338809 - Sealing means for a shaft bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC. Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC One Parklane Blvd, 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc., A subsidiary of Ford Motor Company 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertram, Ulrich Schongauer Weg 19 50129, Bergheim / DE | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, Dr.-Ing., et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02100186.2 | 25.02.2002 | [2003/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1338809 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1338809 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16C3/14, F16C33/74, F01M5/02 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
F16C3/14 (EP);
F02F11/007 (EP);
F16C17/24 (EP);
F16C33/74 (EP);
F16C9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dichtungsvorrichtung für ein Wellenlager | [2003/35] | English: | Sealing means for a shaft bearing | [2003/35] | French: | Etanchéité pour un palier d'arbre | [2003/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 10.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2674905 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1,8 * page 8, paragraphs 1,2; figure 3 *; | [A]BE471392 (AUGEREAU G.) [A] 1,8 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 1; figure 1 * |