EP1349098 - Method of performing geometric measurements on digital radiological images using graphical templates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa HealthCare Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Agfa HealthCare NV Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Agfa HealthCare NV Antwerpsestraat 195 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dewaele, Piet c/o AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800 Septestraat 27 2640, Mortsel / BE | [2008/01] |
Former [2003/40] | 01 /
Dewaele, Piet c/o AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800 Sep 2640, Mortsel / BE | Representative(s) | Theunis, Patrick, et al Agfa-Gevaert N.V. HE / Intellectual Property 3802 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Theunis, Patrick, et al Agfa-Gevaert N.V. HE / Intellectual Property 3802 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Application number, filing date | 02100307.4 | 27.03.2002 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1349098 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1349098 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP);
G06T7/33 (EP);
G06T7/62 (EP);
A61B6/508 (EP);
G06T2207/30008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/26] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur geometrischen Vermessung von digitalen Röntgenbildern unter Benutzung graphischer Vorlagen | [2003/40] | English: | Method of performing geometric measurements on digital radiological images using graphical templates | [2003/40] | French: | Procédé de mesure géométrique d'images numériques de radiologie utilisant des modèles graphiques | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08100464.0 / EP1923809 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.05.2008 | [2009/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9111147 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0616290 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 21 - line 26 * * page 18, line 50 - line 54 ** page 32, line 49 - line 55 *; | [A]WO0155965 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 27 - line 32 * * page 9, line 12 - line 16 * * figure 3 * |