blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1254764

EP1254764 - Decorative plate, especially as ceiling element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.07.2005
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2013Change - prioritypublished on 06.03.2013  [2013/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sibu Design GmbH & Co KG
Jupiterstrasse 8
4452 Ternberg / AT
[2002/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Kurzmann, Kurt
Schmidstra e 17
4400, Steyr / AT
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Müllner, Erwin, et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Dr. Martin Müllner Weihburggasse 9 Postfach 159
1014 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Müllner, Erwin, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte, Dr. Erwin Müllner, Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka, Dr. Martin Müllner, Postfach 159, Weihburggasse 9
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date02100429.630.04.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateAT20010000350U04.05.2001         Original published format: AT 35001 U
[2013/10]
Former [2002/45]AT20010035020U04.05.2001
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1254764
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1254764
Date:11.02.2004
[2004/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2004
ClassificationIPC:E04B9/04, E04B9/32
[2004/07]
CPC:
E04B9/045 (EP); B32B15/08 (EP); B44C5/0415 (EP);
B44F1/02 (EP); E04B9/0464 (EP); E04B9/32 (EP);
E04F13/0871 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2002/45]B32B3/10, B32B15/08, E04F13/08, E04B9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Dekorplatte, insbesondere als Deckenelement[2002/45]
English:Decorative plate, especially as ceiling element[2002/45]
French:Plaque décorative, en particulier comme élément de plafond[2002/45]
Examination procedure06.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/24]
11.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/35]
30.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2850596  (TEXTILKUNST HERBERT STAPS GMBH) [Y] 1 * page 5, paragraph 2; figure -; claims 6,7 * * page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 1 *;
 [Y]US4386130  (HAYASHI KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0538727  (ZUMTOBEL LICHT [AT]) [A] 1* abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.