EP1271710 - Electrical connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 53, rue de Châteaudun 75009 Paris / FR | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boiret, Gérard L'Orée 72530, YVRE L'EVEQUE / FR | 02 /
Provost, Christophe 30, rue du Pré Vert 72400, CHERRE / FR | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al SCHMIT CHRETIEN 8, Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Christian Schmit et Associés, 8, place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | Application number, filing date | 02100708.3 | 13.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | FR20010008217 | 21.06.2001 Original published format: FR 0108217 | [2003/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271710 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271710 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/646, H01R13/658 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H01R13/6585 (EP);
H01R24/40 (EP);
H01R9/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbindungsanordnung | [2003/01] | English: | Electrical connection | [2003/01] | French: | Liaison de continuité électrique | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 12.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.11.2003 | CY | 26.11.2003 | ES | 26.11.2003 | FI | 26.11.2003 | IE | 26.11.2003 | IT | 26.11.2003 | NL | 26.11.2003 | TR | 26.11.2003 | DK | 26.02.2004 | GR | 26.02.2004 | SE | 26.02.2004 | PT | 26.04.2004 | LU | 13.06.2004 | BE | 30.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/38] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CY | 26.11.2003 | ||
ES | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
IE | 26.11.2003 | ||
IT | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
TR | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 13.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
CY | 26.11.2003 | ||
ES | 26.11.2003 | ||
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
IE | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
TR | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 13.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
IE | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
TR | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 13.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
IE | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 13.06.2004 | ||
BE | 30.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
IE | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
LU | 13.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
IE | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
IE | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
DK | 26.02.2004 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
IE | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
NL | 26.11.2003 | ||
GR | 26.02.2004 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 26.11.2003 | |
FI | 26.11.2003 | ||
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 26.11.2003 | |
SE | 26.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 26.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3569915 (SORENSEN STANLEY J, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US3825874 (PEVERILL W) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4382653 (BLANCHARD LINDEN O) [A] 1,3,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 6 *; | [A]US4598969 (STEPHENSON ROGER C [US]) [A] 1,4,5,9 * abstract * * column 3, lines 14-19; figure 3 * |