EP1273952 - Confocal microscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems Wetzlar GmbH Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [2003/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sure, Thomas, Dr. Ahornweg 9 35641 Schöffengrund / DE | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Werner Franz Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Reichert, Werner Franz Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | Reichert, Werner F., Dr. Leica Microsystems AG, Konzernstelle Patente + Marken, Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 02100769.5 | 01.07.2002 | [2003/02] | Priority number, date | DE2001133017 | 06.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10133017 | [2003/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1273952 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1273952 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G02B21/08 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
G02B21/0032 (EP,US);
G02B21/0044 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/02] | G02B21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/07] |
Former [2003/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Konfokales Mikroskop | [2003/02] | English: | Confocal microscope | [2003/02] | French: | Microscope confocal | [2003/02] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/48] | 27.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1083065 (ZEISS CARL FA) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4515445 (MUELLER GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5032720 (WHITE JOHN G [GB]) [X] 18 * column 2, line 18 - column 2, line 5; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE4323129 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE]) [X] 18 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 7 ** column 3, line 63 - column 5, line 23 *; | [X]DE19942998 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE10017823 (TILL I D GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1,12 * paragraphs [0018] - [0025] *; | [A] - SCHLICHTING J ET AL, "LICHT AUS DEM OBJEKTIV. LIGHT FROM THE LENS SYSTEM", F & M FEINWERKTECHNIK MIKROTECHNIK MIKROELEKTRONIK, CARL HANSER GMBH & CO, DE, (19970601), vol. 105, no. 6, ISSN 0944-1018, pages 447 - 448,450, XP000730771 [A] 1 * page 449, column 3, line 8 - page 450, column 2, line 2; figure 2 * |