EP1281591 - Controller and control method for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/06] | Controller and control method, in particular in a motor vehicle | ||
[2006/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, Armin Kerschgraben 90602 Pyrbaum / DE | 02 /
Wiehoff, Hans-Jörg Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Str. 33 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2003/06] | Application number, filing date | 02102008.6 | 08.07.2002 | [2003/06] | Priority number, date | DE2001138258 | 03.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10138258 | [2003/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1281591 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1281591 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1281591 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
B60T8/17551 (EP);
B60T13/741 (EP);
B60T8/3255 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/24] |
Former [2003/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Regelungsverfahren sowie Regler für den Automobilbereich | [2006/14] | English: | Controller and control method for a motor vehicle | [2006/14] | French: | Régulateur et méthode de régulation pour véhicule automobile | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/06] | Regelungsverfahren sowie Regler, insbesondere für den Automobilbereich | ||
Former [2003/06] | Controller and control method, in particular in a motor vehicle | ||
Former [2003/06] | Régulateur et méthode de régulation, notamment pour véhicule automobile | Examination procedure | 06.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 06.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4324205 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 68 - column 5, line 25 * * figures 1,4 *; | [X]US5455770 (HADELER RALF [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 1, line 21 - line 43 * * column 6, line 50 - line 63 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE19949286 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * column 12, line 16 - line 23 * * claims 1,2,14 ** figure 2 * |