EP1294087 - Power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bose Corporation The Mountain Framingham, MA 01701-9168 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states BOSE CORPORATION The Mountain Framingham, Massachusetts 01701-9168 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiu, Sean S. 33 Paris Street, No. 101 MA 01752, Marlborough / US | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02102133.2 | 13.08.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | US20010954740 | 17.09.2001 Original published format: US 954740 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1294087 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1294087 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1294087 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/217 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
H02M1/4208 (EP,US);
H02M7/217 (EP,US);
H02M1/32 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/18] |
Former [2003/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stromversorgung | [2003/12] | English: | Power supply | [2003/12] | French: | Alimentation de puissance | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4001668 (LEWIS ROBERT E) [Y] 2-5 * figures 4,5 *; | [XY]DE3501519 (BIOTEC BIOTECHNISCHE APPARATEB [DE]) [X] 1,10 * page 4, line 8 - line 25; figure 1 * [Y] 2-5; | [X]DE19508885 (PEPPERL & FUCHS [DE]) [X] 8 * figure 3 *; | [A]US6061259 (DEMICHELE GLENN [US]) [A] 1,6,7* column 7, line 28 - line 61; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE3501519 | DE19508885 |