EP1303032 - Control device for a resonant converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2006/29] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2005/43] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/16] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reinhold, Elferich c/o Philips Corp. Int. Prop. GmbH Postfach 500442 52088, Aachen / DE | 02 /
Dürbaum, Thomas c/o Philips Corp. Int. Prop. GmbH Postfach 500442 52088, Aachen / DE | 03 /
Raets, Hubert c/o Philips Corp. Int. Prop. GmbH Postfach 500442 52088, Aachen / DE | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02102290.0 | 03.09.2002 | [2003/16] | Priority number, date | DE2001152194 | 23.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10152194 | DE2001143251 | 04.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10143251 | DE2001148932 | 04.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10148932 | [2003/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1303032 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1303032 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/337, H02M3/28 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
H02M3/3376 (EP,US);
H02M3/33561 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/16] | Title | German: | Regelvorrichtung für einen resonanten Konverter@ | [2003/16] | English: | Control device for a resonant converter | [2003/16] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour un convertisseur résonnant | [2003/16] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4680688 (INOU KIYOHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE3912849 (CEAG LICHT & STROM [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column A * * column 1, line 38 - line 46 * * column 3, line 4 - line 9 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0720278 (ALCATEL NV [NL]) [A] 1,10 * column A * * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 18 * * figure 3 *; | [A]DE19711817 (ABB DAIMLER BENZ TRANSP [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 9 - line 14 * * column 2, line 24 - line 30 * * figure 4 *; | [X]WO0069059 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,10 * column A * * page 11, line 13 - line 20 * * figure 1 *; | [E]EP1257047 (PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE], et al) [E] 1,10* column A * |