EP1296420 - Electrical socket connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 53, rue de Châteaudun 75009 Paris / FR | [2003/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBEAU, Pascal 17, rue Keppler 72100, LE MANS / FR | 02 /
CHABIRAND, Rachel 13, résidence des Landes 75470, CHAMPAGNE / FR | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al SCHMIT CHRETIEN 8, Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Christian Schmit et Associés, 8, place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | Application number, filing date | 02102374.2 | 20.09.2002 | [2003/13] | Priority number, date | FR20010012174 | 20.09.2001 Original published format: FR 0112174 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1296420 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/04 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
H01R24/58 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/51] |
Former [2003/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Steckdose | [2003/13] | English: | Electrical socket connector | [2003/13] | French: | Prise femelle électrique | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 21.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5580261 (MEYNIER CHRISTOPHE [FR]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 34 * [Y] 2-10; | [Y]US6077126 (PENG YAO-CHE [TW]) [Y] 2-10 * column 1, line 61 - column 3, line 9 *; | [A]US6270380 (SHICHIDA AKIHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* column 5, line 20 - column 10, line 2 * |