EP1312900 - Weighing scale with support for goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, CY, NL, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo GmbH Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | [2016/07] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo AG Im Langacher 8606 Greifensee / CH | ||
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo GmbH Im Langacher, P.O. Box MT-100 8606 Greifensee / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lüchinger, Paul Guldenenstrasse 49 8610 Uster / CH | [2003/21] | Application number, filing date | 02102703.2 | 24.09.2001 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | CH20001957 | 04.10.2000 Original published format: CH 20001957 | [2003/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1312900 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312900 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01G21/22 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
G01G21/22 (EP,US);
G01G21/28 (EP,US);
G01G23/012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Waage mit Träger für das Wägegut | [2003/21] | English: | Weighing scale with support for goods | [2003/21] | French: | Balance avec support pour produits | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 19.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01203641.4 / EP1195586 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010203641) is 26.08.2002 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Request for further processing for: | 23.01.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.05.2015 | DK | 27.05.2015 | ES | 27.05.2015 | FI | 27.05.2015 | IT | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | NL | 27.05.2015 | SE | 27.05.2015 | TR | 27.05.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | AT | 24.09.2015 | GB | 24.09.2015 | IE | 24.09.2015 | LU | 24.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/17] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
AT | 24.09.2015 | ||
GB | 24.09.2015 | ||
IE | 24.09.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
GB | 24.09.2015 | ||
IE | 24.09.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
GB | 24.09.2015 | ||
IE | 24.09.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IE | 24.09.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
IT | 27.05.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2310553 (AUTOMATISME CIE GLE [FR]) [Y] 5,9* page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 2 *; | [XY]DE3610560 (LEUTHEUSER HEINZ) [X] 1 * column A; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5,9; | [Y]EP0371210 (METTLER TOLEDO AG [CH]) [Y] 4 * figures 4-6 *; | [X]EP0897104 (BUSCH WERKE AG [CH]) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 35 - line 51 * * column 2, line 5 - line 6 * * column 3, line 7 - line 13 * | by applicant | DE3610560 | JPS62266421 | US4766965 | EP0371210 | EP0897104 |