EP1227669 - Image sensing apparatus, shading correction method, program, and storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shirakawa, Yusuke c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2011/49] |
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
Shirakawa, Yusuke c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/49] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/31] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250153.0 | 10.01.2002 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | JP20010009474 | 17.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001009474 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1227669 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1227669 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227669 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/217, H04N5/232 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
H04N25/63 (EP,US);
H04N23/663 (EP,US);
H04N25/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/07] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmevorrichtung, Schattierungskorrekturverfahren, Programm und Speichermedium | [2002/31] | English: | Image sensing apparatus, shading correction method, program, and storage medium | [2002/31] | French: | Dispositif de prise de vues, procédé de correction de l'effet d'ombre, logiciel et support d'enregistrement | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 05.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH06197266 (SONY CORP); | [Y]US5589882 (SHIRAISHI AKIHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US6029017 (MIYAZAWA MASAYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2000196953 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JP2000236480 (MINOLTA CO LTD); | [A]US6157781 (KONNO TATSUO [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1067777 (CANON KK [JP]) |