12.10.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] |
04.11.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] |
03.11.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.11.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.06.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.05.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
20.02.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.02.2009 |
First examination report |
|
23.01.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.01.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
12.12.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
02.05.2008 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
25.04.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
20.03.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] |