Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4574022B | Global Dossier | 04.11.2010 | B2 | JP2002218298 | 02.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001009474 | 17.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1227669 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2011 | B1 | EP1227669 | 04.06.2008 | A3 | EP1227669 | 31.07.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001009474 | 17.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1226864C | 09.11.2005 | C | CN1366423 | 28.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001009474 | 17.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6937777 | 30.08.2005 | B2 | US2002094131 | 18.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001009474 | 17.01.2001 |