EP1238735 - Ergonomic miter saw handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techtronic Industries Co., Ltd. 24/F, CDW Building, 388 Castle Peak Road Tsuen Wan New Territories, Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Techtronic Industries Co., Ltd. 24/F, CDW Building, 388 Castle Peak Road Tsuen Wan New Territories, Hong Kong / CN | ||
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states TechTronic Industries, Co., Ltd 24/F., CDW Building 388 Castle Peak Road Tsuen Wan, N.T. Hong Kong / CN | ||
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Techtronic Industries Co., Ltd. Units B-F, 24th Floor, CDW Building, 388 Castle Peak Road Tsuen Wan, New Territories, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dils Jeffrey M. 5 Dempsey Glen Lane Simpsonville South Carolina 29681 / US | 02 /
Brazell Kenneth M. 121 Kingsland, Piedmond South Carolina 29673 / US | 03 /
Wacker Charles M. 801.N. Federal Street, Apt.#2132 Chandler, Arizona 85226 / US | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/29] | Bucks, Teresa Anne BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/24] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/37] | Bucks, Teresa Anne, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250546.5 | 28.01.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | US20010771775 | 29.01.2001 Original published format: US 771775 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1238735 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1238735 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1238735 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23D45/04, B27B5/29 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
B23D45/044 (EP,US);
B27B5/29 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7697 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7705 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7788 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8773 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/37] | Title | German: | Ergonomischer Handgriff für eine Gehrungssäge | [2002/37] | English: | Ergonomic miter saw handle | [2002/37] | French: | Poignée ergonomique pour une scie à onglet | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 28.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.2005 | BE | 19.10.2005 | CH | 19.10.2005 | CY | 19.10.2005 | FI | 19.10.2005 | IT | 19.10.2005 | LI | 19.10.2005 | NL | 19.10.2005 | TR | 19.10.2005 | DK | 19.01.2006 | GR | 19.01.2006 | SE | 19.01.2006 | ES | 30.01.2006 | IE | 30.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | PT | 20.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IT | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
TR | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
IE | 30.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IT | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
IE | 30.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
IE | 30.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
BE | 19.10.2005 | ||
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
CH | 19.10.2005 | ||
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
LI | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0779122 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5778747 (CHEN RUEY-ZON [TW]) [A] 1* column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 64; figures 1-6 * |