EP1228892 - Multicolor image forming material and method for forming multicolor image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Change - representative | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Mitsuru c/o Fuji Photo film Co, Ltd. 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Sugiyama, Susumu c/o Fuji Photo film Co., Ltd, 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Shimomura, Akihiro c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
Hatakeyama, Akira c/o Fuji Photo Film Co, Ltd., 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | ||
Former [2002/32] | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Wilson Gunn Gee, Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250725.5 | 01.02.2002 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | JP20010027142 | 02.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001027142 | JP20010079551 | 19.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001079551 | JP20010079587 | 19.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001079587 | JP20020019846 | 29.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002019846 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1228892 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1228892 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/34, B41M5/40, B41M5/38, B41M5/00 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
B41M5/345 (EP,US);
B41M5/38207 (EP,US);
B41M5/38257 (EP,US);
B41M2205/02 (EP,US);
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/13] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mehrfarben-Bilderzeugungsmaterial und Verfahren | [2002/32] | English: | Multicolor image forming material and method for forming multicolor image | [2002/32] | French: | Matériau et procédé pour la formation d'image multicolore | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/20] | 02.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/20] | Divisional application(s) | EP05026553.7 / EP1640174 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0530018 (ICI PLC [GB]) [AD] 1-17 * page 3, line 30 - line 32 * * page 5, line 9 - line 28 *; | [Y]EP0556797 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 2,3,17 * page 7, line 12 - line 20 * * tables 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0556796 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 2,3,17 * page 6, line 20 - line 28 ** table 1 *; | [A]EP0696518 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * page 3, line 43 - line 49 * * page 5, line 23 - line 57 *; | [AY]WO9847718 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 21 - line 24 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 19 * * claims 1-3 * [Y] 2,3,17; | [Y]US5866504 (OKADA SHINJI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,17 * column 4, line 39 - line 46 *; | [Y]DE19954103 (RICOH KK [JP]) [Y] 2,3,17 * page 2, line 49 - line 50 * * page 3, line 43 - line 50 *; | [E]EP1226972 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,7-16 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 51 * * page 10, line 56 - page 11, line 6 * * page 12, line 5 - line 7 * * page 14, line 46 - page 15, line 16 * * page 16, line 15 - line 34 * |