EP1231768 - Camera, printer, print system, control method, memory medium, and program therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiraiwa, Yoshinobu c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | 01 /
Shiraiwa, Yoshinobu c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2002/33] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co., 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250783.4 | 06.02.2002 | [2002/33] | Priority number, date | JP20010031248 | 07.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001031248 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1231768 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1231768 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
H04N1/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/12 (KR);
H04N23/90 (US);
H04N1/00278 (EP,US);
H04N1/00395 (EP,US);
H04N1/00458 (EP,US);
H04N1/00477 (EP,US);
H04N1/00901 (EP,US);
H04N1/2112 (EP,US);
H04N1/2154 (EP,US);
H04N1/00885 (EP,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0036 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0041 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0049 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0084 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | H04N1/00, H04N1/21, G06K15/00 | ||
Former IPC [2002/33] | H04N1/00, H04N1/21 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/33] | Title | German: | Kamera, Drucker, Drucksystem, Kontrollverfahren, Speichermedium und Programm | [2002/33] | English: | Camera, printer, print system, control method, memory medium, and program therefor | [2002/33] | French: | Caméra, imprimante, système d'impression, système de contrôle, médium de mémoire et programme informatique | [2002/33] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.08.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 02.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | EP05076365.5 / EP1587296 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH1117993 ; | [XA]US5784581 (HANNAH ERIC C [US]); | [A]EP0860980 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) | Examination | JPH11252489 | by applicant | US5784581 | EP0860980 | JPH1117993 | JPH11252489 |