EP1234830 - Method of preparing an organosilicon compound containing a methacryloxy functional group [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Silicone Co., Ltd. 1-3, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Dow Corning Toray Silicone Co., Ltd. 1-3, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakita, K., c/o Dow Corning Toray Silicone Co Ltd. 2-2 Chigusa Kaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Shirahata, A., Dow Corning Toray Silicone Co. Ltd. 2-2 Chigusa Kaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba Prefecture / JP | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Kyle, Diana Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250922.8 | 11.02.2002 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | JP20010046973 | 22.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001046973 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1234830 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1234830 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1234830 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
C07F7/1892 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [2004/32] |
Former [2002/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von eine Methacryloxyfunktionellegruppe enthaltenden Organosiliziumverbindungen | [2004/35] | English: | Method of preparing an organosilicon compound containing a methacryloxy functional group | [2002/35] | French: | Procédé de préparation de composés organosiliciques contenant un groupement à fonction méthacrylique | [2002/35] |
Former [2002/35] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Methakryloxyfunktionellegruppe enthaltende Organosiliziumverbindungen | Examination procedure | 25.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 16.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.01.2005 | [2006/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4946977 (BERNHARDT GUENTHER [DE], et al) [AD] 1-9* the whole document *; | [AY]US5117027 (BERNHARDT GUENTHER [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * * column 1, line 17 - line 62 * [Y] 1-9; | [YD]JPH05306290 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [YD] 1-9 * abstract * |