EP1271203 - Imaging system for use with optical MEMS devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neilson, David T 11 Eisenhower Drive Old Bridge, New Jersey 08857 / US | 02 /
Ryf, Roland 2 Dolan Avenue Aberdeen, New Jersey 07747 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Ltd 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02250956.6 | 12.02.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | US20010896085 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: US 896085 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271203 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271203 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/35, G02B26/08 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/3582 (EP,US);
G02B26/0841 (EP,US);
G02B6/3512 (EP,US);
G02B6/3556 (EP,US);
G02B6/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/39] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Abbildungssystem für optische MEMS Geräte | [2003/01] | English: | Imaging system for use with optical MEMS devices | [2003/01] | French: | Système d'imagerie pour des dispositifs MEMS optiques | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29618818U (CMS MIKROSYSTEME GMBH CHEMNITZ [DE]) [A] 1-5,7,11-13 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 53 * * column 6, line 17 - line 53 * * column 8, line 21 - line 30 ** column 8, line 59 - column 9, line 57; figures 1,2,6-8 *; | [A]US6097859 (SOLGAARD OLAV [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7,11-13 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]CA2325611 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,7,11 * page 11, line 8 - page 12, line 16 * * page 14, line 8 - line 29 * * page 16, line 4 - line 29; figures 4,6,7 * [A] 4,5,12,13; | [PX]WO0171409 (ONIX MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [PX] 1-3,7,8,10,11 * page 4, line 13 - page 6, line 32; figures 3,4 * |