EP1241176 - Purine derivatives for the treatment of ischemia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, CT 06340 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Pfizer Products Inc. Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deninno, Michael Paul, Pfizer Global Research and Development, Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | 02 /
Masamune, Hiroko, Pfizer Global Research and Development, Eastern Point Road Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Hayles, James Richard, et al Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Hayles, James Richard, et al Pfizer Limited Patents Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2002/38] | Hayles, James Richard, et al UK Patent Department, Pfizer Limited, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02251174.5 | 20.02.2002 | [2002/38] | Priority number, date | US20010276411P | 16.03.2001 Original published format: US 276411 P | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1241176 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/16, C07D473/34, C07D471/04, A61K31/7076, A61P9/10, // (C07D471/04, 235:00, 221:00) | [2002/38] | CPC: |
C07D473/00 (EP,US);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | Purinderivate zur Behandlung von Ischämie | [2002/38] | English: | Purine derivatives for the treatment of ischemia | [2002/38] | French: | Dérivés de purine pour le traitement de l'ischémie | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 29.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/10] | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5688774 (JACOBSON KENNETH A [US], et al) [DA] 1-11 * claim - *; | [A]WO9808855 (CV THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim - *; | [A]WO0023447 (AVENTIS PHARM PROD INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim - *; | [PA]WO0123399 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [PA] 1-11* claim - * |