EP1236825 - Improvements relating to wall mounted foldable drier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILLS INDUSTRIES LIMITED Pontygwindy Industrial Estate Caerphilly Mid Glamorgan CF83 3HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Hills Industries Limited Pontygwindy Industrial Estate Caerphilly, Mid Glamorgan CF83 3HU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Byard, Paul 8 Kingswood, Maesycoed Pontypridd, Mid Glamorgan CF37 1QE / GB | 02 /
Roberts, Huw Ty Newydd, Corntown Road Ewenny, Bridgend CF35 5BH / GB | 03 /
Bathard, Simon 63 Caer Worgan Llantwit Major, Vale Glamorgan CF61 2SP / GB | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | James, Michael John Gwynne, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James Morgan Arcade Chambers 33, St. Mary Street Cardiff Glamorgan CF1 2AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | James, Michael John Gwynne, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James Morgan Arcade Chambers 33, St. Mary Street Cardiff Clamorgan CF1 2AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 02251213.1 | 22.02.2002 | [2002/36] | Priority number, date | GB20010004689 | 26.02.2001 Original published format: GB 0104689 | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1236825 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1236825 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D06F57/12 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
D06F57/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/36] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen für zusammenklappbare Wandwäschetrockner | [2002/36] | English: | Improvements relating to wall mounted foldable drier | [2002/36] | French: | Améliorations des séchoirs pliables à paroi | [2002/36] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.2004 | BE | 06.05.2004 | CH | 06.05.2004 | FI | 06.05.2004 | FR | 06.05.2004 | IT | 06.05.2004 | LI | 06.05.2004 | NL | 06.05.2004 | TR | 06.05.2004 | DK | 06.08.2004 | GR | 06.08.2004 | SE | 06.08.2004 | ES | 17.08.2004 | PT | 06.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/38] | AT | 06.05.2004 | |
BE | 06.05.2004 | ||
CH | 06.05.2004 | ||
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
FR | 06.05.2004 | ||
IT | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
NL | 06.05.2004 | ||
TR | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 06.05.2004 | |
BE | 06.05.2004 | ||
CH | 06.05.2004 | ||
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
FR | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
NL | 06.05.2004 | ||
TR | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.05.2004 | |
BE | 06.05.2004 | ||
CH | 06.05.2004 | ||
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
FR | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
NL | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 06.05.2004 | |
BE | 06.05.2004 | ||
CH | 06.05.2004 | ||
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
NL | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 06.05.2004 | |
BE | 06.05.2004 | ||
CH | 06.05.2004 | ||
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
DK | 06.08.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 06.05.2004 | |
BE | 06.05.2004 | ||
CH | 06.05.2004 | ||
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 06.05.2004 | |
CH | 06.05.2004 | ||
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
FI | 06.05.2004 | ||
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
ES | 17.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
LI | 06.05.2004 | ||
SE | 06.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 06.05.2004 | |
LI | 06.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3521757 (LIEBSCHER JOHANNES) [DA] 1-3* the whole document *; | [Y]FR2071367 (SICAM) [Y] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [Y]CH630676 (LEIFHEIT INTERNATIONAL [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, column 1, line 60 - page 2, column 2, line 20; page 3, column 1, line 16 - page 3, column2 , line 40; figures * |