EP1239623 - Optical wavelength division multiplex signal monitoring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2011/19] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shake, Ippei, NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
Takara, Hidehiko, NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Maggs, Michael Norman, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02251601.7 | 07.03.2002 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | JP20010064042 | 07.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001064042 | JP20010342257 | 07.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001342257 | [2002/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1239623 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1239623 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239623 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
H04J14/02 (EP,US);
H04B10/07953 (EP,US);
H04L7/0075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/46] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Wellenlängenmultiplexsignal Überwachungsgerät | [2002/37] | English: | Optical wavelength division multiplex signal monitoring apparatus | [2002/37] | French: | Appareil de surveillance pour signaux multiplexés en longueurs d'onde optique | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 09.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 11.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.10.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.10.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0920150 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [DA] 1-19 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 10 - page 4, paragraph 26 * * page 5, paragraph 49 - page 10, paragraph 101 * * page 11, paragraph 104 - paragraph 109 * * page 12, paragraph 118 - paragraph 122 * * figures 1,8,12,14,17 *; | [A]US5995255 (GILES CLINTON RANDY [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 4, line 9 ** figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO0013350 (E TEK ELECTROPHOTONICS SOLUTIO [CA]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 18 * * page 5, line 2 - line 5 * * page 6, line 17 - page 9, line 6 * * page 12, line 12 - page 13, line 10 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO0041351 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 6 * * page 3, line 14 - line 31 * * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 36 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO0048337 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - page 4, line 21 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 22 * * page 10, line 9 - line 18 * * figure 1 * |