EP1251213 - Structural timber floor assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marlow & Co. Ltd. Marlow House, Hollow Road Bury St. Edmunds Suffolk IP32 7AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states Marlow & Co. Ltd. Marlow House, Hollow Road Bury St. Edmunds, Suffolk IP32 7AP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Roger The Firs, Old Norton Road, Thurston Bury St Edmunds, Suffolk IP31 3PB / GB | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Nash, Keith Wilfrid, et al Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Nash, Keith Wilfrid, et al KEITH W. NASH & Co., 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02251738.7 | 12.03.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | GB20010009966 | 21.04.2001 Original published format: GB 0109966 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1251213 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1251213 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04B5/12, E04B1/26 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
E04B5/12 (EP,US);
E04B5/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/43] | E04B5/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zusammengesetzte Holztragstruktur für Böden | [2002/43] | English: | Structural timber floor assembly | [2002/43] | French: | Ensemble de construction en bois pour planchers | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 04.12.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB665974 (REMI DIRCKX) [Y] 1-5,9,10,12 * the whole document *; | [X]FR1081052 (DAMBRINE GEORGES) [X] 11* the whole document *; | [YA]GB961938 (CAROMIC AND COMPANY LTD) [Y] 1-5,9,10,12 * page 1, line 69 - page 2, line 24 * * figure 2; claim 1 * [A] 7,8 |