Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02063005 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2003 | A3 | WO02063005 | 15.08.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US26691001 | 06.02.2001 | US27685501 | 16.03.2001 | US27976001 | 28.03.2001 | US28381801 | 13.04.2001 | US27689101 | 16.03.2001 | US28540501 | 20.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004086905 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26691001 | 06.02.2001 | US0203813 | 06.02.2002 | US27685501 | 16.03.2001 | US27976001 | 28.03.2001 | US28381801 | 13.04.2001 | US27689101 | 16.03.2001 | US46724803 | 06.08.2003 | US28540501 | 20.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005503112 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US26691001 | 06.02.2001 | US0203813 | 06.02.2002 | US27685501 | 16.03.2001 | US27976001 | 28.03.2001 | US28381801 | 13.04.2001 | US27689101 | 16.03.2001 | US28540501 | 20.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1358329 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US26691001 | 06.02.2001 | US0203813 | 06.02.2002 | US27685501 | 16.03.2001 | US27976001 | 28.03.2001 | US28381801 | 13.04.2001 | US27689101 | 16.03.2001 | US28540501 | 20.04.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2437497 | 15.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US26691001 | 06.02.2001 | US0203813 | 06.02.2002 | US27685501 | 16.03.2001 | US27976001 | 28.03.2001 | US28381801 | 13.04.2001 | US27689101 | 16.03.2001 | US28540501 | 20.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1241281 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27689101 | 16.03.2001 |