EP1241281 - Tin plating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shipley Co. L.L.C. 455 Forest Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2002/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heber, Jochen Alpenstrasse 32 6010 Kriens / CH | 02 /
Egli, Andr- Etzeistrasse 28 8712 Staefa / CH | 03 /
Toben, Michael P. 8 Quincy Lane Smithtown, New York 11787 / US | 04 /
Schwager, Felix Rueggiswilstrasse 15 6045 Meggen / CH | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2002/38] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Operations Patent Dept. Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 02251833.6 | 14.03.2002 | [2002/38] | Priority number, date | US20010276891P | 16.03.2001 Original published format: US 276891 P | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1241281 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/10, C25D5/12, C23C28/02 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
B32B15/01 (EP);
C22C13/02 (EP);
C25D5/12 (EP);
H01L23/49582 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/23] |
Former [2002/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Zinnplattierung | [2002/38] | English: | Tin plating | [2002/38] | French: | Déposition d'étain | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 05.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/18] | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04329891 ; | [X]JPS60155695 ; | [XA]JPH0790674 ; | [A]JP2000195885 ; | [A]JPH03291386 ; | JPH04329891 [ ]; | [X]US4429021 (HIGASHI MITSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9 * column 8; example -; table 1 *; | [X]US4731301 (HIGUCHI SEIJUN [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9 * example 2; table 3 * * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0468787 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,8,10 * first embodiment *; | [A]US5454929 (KINGHORN DAVID H [US]) [A] 1,2,4,8,10 * claims 1-3,6-9,12,15,16 *; | [A]US5853557 (SOUZA THERESE R [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,8,10 * abstract * * claims 1,2,5-8 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930402), vol. 017, no. 171, Database accession no. (C - 1044), & JP04329891 A 19921118 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1-3,6,8-10 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 39, Database accession no. 1985-239608, XP002202408 & JPS60155695 A 19850815 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-3,6,8,9 * abstract * | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 22, Database accession no. 1995-167824, XP002202409 & JPH0790674 A 19950404 (MITSUBISHI SHINDO KK) [X] 1,2,6,8,10 * abstract * [A] 3,7,9 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 55, Database accession no. 2000-581844, XP002202426 & JP2000195885 A 20000714 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,2,5,8,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920331), vol. 016, no. 126, Database accession no. (C - 0923), & JP03291386 A 19911220 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1,2,8,10 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1980-54256C, XP002202407 & JPH04329891 A 19921118 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [ ] * abstract * | Examination | - KUHL ET AL, "Assuring Whisker-free Components", STM MAGAZINE, (1995), pages 48 - 49, XP008031376 |