EP1247891 - A carpet tile containing resin and bitumen processed at low temperatures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Collins & Aikman Floorcoverings, Inc. 311 Smith Industrial Boulevard, P.O. Box 1447 Dalton Georgia 30722 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Collins & Aikman Floorcoverings, Inc. 311 Smith Industrial Boulevard, P.O. Box 1447 Dalton, Georgia 30722 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davies, Keith Barkway The Mount, Newport Road Llantaman, Gwent NP3 3AF / GB | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252370.8 | 02.04.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | US20010826456 | 05.04.2001 Original published format: US 826456 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1247891 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1247891 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D06N7/00, C09D195/00 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
D03D27/00 (EP,US);
D06N7/0071 (EP,US);
B32B2305/18 (EP,US);
B32B2395/00 (EP,US);
B32B2471/00 (EP,US);
D06N2203/061 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IE [2005/04] |
Former [2002/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Harz und bei niedrigen Temperaturen bearbeitbares Bitumen enthaltende Teppichfliese | [2002/41] | English: | A carpet tile containing resin and bitumen processed at low temperatures | [2002/41] | French: | Dalle de moquette contenant de la résine et du bitume pouvant être traités à basses temperatures | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/30] | 07.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.04.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH01123862 ; | [A]JPS54125829 ; | [XAY]GB1378961 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,11 * page 3, line 1 - line 19; example -; claims 1,2 * * page 3, line 60 - line 82 * [A] 13-17 [Y] 3,6; | [A]EP0278690 (HEUGA HOLDING BV [NL]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2219802 (VULCANITE LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-17* page 2, line 16 - line 26; example -; claims 1,3,4 *; | [YA]WO9115625 (INTERFACE INC [US]) [Y] 3,6 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 7; claims 1-3,8,10,12 * * page 7, line 10 - line 36 * [A] 1-17; | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 25, Database accession no. 1989-184022, XP002272044 & JPH01123862 A 19890516 (FUJI KOSAN KK) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9,11 * abstract * [A] 13-17 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 45, Database accession no. 1979-81564B, XP002272045 & JPS54125829 A 19790929 (NIPPON OIL KK) [A] 1-17 * abstract * |