EP1253489 - Electronic timepiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2008/23] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogasawara, Kenji, c/o Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252640.4 | 15.04.2002 | [2002/44] | Priority number, date | JP20010132738 | 27.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001132738 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1253489 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1253489 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1253489 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G04G19/12, G04C10/00, // G04C3/14, G04G13/02 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
G04G19/12 (EP,US);
G04G13/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/04] | G04G19/12, G04G1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2002/44] | G04G19/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2004/42] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisches Uhrwerk | [2002/44] | English: | Electronic timepiece | [2002/44] | French: | Pièce d'horlogerie électronique | [2002/44] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 13.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4860005 (DELUCA JOAN S [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 65 - column 3, line 14 *; | [A]EP1006640 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8* page 2, line 3 - page 4, line 12 *; | [A]EP1041462 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, lines 13-45 * |