EP1254741 - Spindle protective structure in spindle-through coolant feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | ||
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Aza-komanba Shibokusa, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsuzawa, Yukio 1915-5 Funatsu, Kawaguchikomachi Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0301 / JP | 02 /
Nakazawa, Yasuyuki 2-4-10 Tokiwadai, Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi 403-0015 / JP | 03 /
Seki, Tomohiro 2520-18, Funatsu, Kawaguchikomachi Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0301 / JP | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252815.2 | 22.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | JP20010127966 | 25.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001127966 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1254741 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254741 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/10, F16J15/32, F16L27/08 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
B23Q11/103 (EP,US);
F16J15/164 (EP,US);
Y10T409/303976 (EP,US);
Y10T409/304032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2003/30] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schutzvorrichtung für Spindel mit innerer Kühlmittelzufuhr | [2002/45] | English: | Spindle protective structure in spindle-through coolant feeder | [2002/45] | French: | Structure de protection d'une broche à passage interne du réfrigérant | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4822059 (SHIMASAKI KEIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5072948 (KOSTRZEWSKI RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1,5,7-9 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,6,10; | [Y]EP0519904 (VOEST ALPINE IND ANLAGEN [AT]) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0878896 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 10* abstract *; | [YA]EP0924026 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1 |