EP1271990 - Method and apparatus for selecting a service provider depending on availability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goss, Stephen C. 1920 Childs Street Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US | 02 /
Hruska, George Jay 6 S 545 Millcreek Lane Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | 03 /
Light, Jeffrey Ross 7331 Kildare Avenue Lincolnwood, Illinois 60646 / US | 04 /
Liu, Chung-zin 2623 Wendy Drive Naperville, Illinois 60565 / US | 05 /
Salvador, Omar Hernando 1487 Briar Cove Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US | 06 /
Shah, Gitesh P. 1869, Morgan Circle Naperville, Illinois 60565 / US | 07 /
Stockert, Mark Kevin 2 Bardmore Park 1107-02 Ardmore View / SG | 08 /
Strom, Kenneth Wayne 1621 Kildeer Drive Naperville, Illinois 60565 / US | 09 /
Varvaro, Charles 22 W 410 Burdette Avenue Glendale Heights, Illinois 60139 / US | 10 /
Wilson, Randall Joe 613 Buttonwood Circle Naperville, Illinois 60540-6312 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Ltd 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252848.3 | 23.04.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | US20010882574 | 14.06.2001 Original published format: US 882574 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271990 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/39] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Auswahl eines Dienbstanbieters in Abhängigkeit der Verfügbarkeit | [2003/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for selecting a service provider depending on availability | [2003/01] | French: | Procédé et appareil de sélection d'un fournisseur des services en fonction de la disponibilité | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 17.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | 02.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5734980 (HOOPER JEFF DUWAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7 * figure 2 *; | [X]EP1009183 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * column 11, line 31 - column 12, line 50 *; | [A]US6128491 (AUGUSTINUS GREG [AU]) [A] 1,6* column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 18 * |