EP1253291 - A turbine blade having a cooled tip shroud [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bunker, Ronald Scott 1372 Clifton Park Road Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2002/44] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252959.8 | 26.04.2002 | [2002/44] | Priority number, date | US20010681553 | 27.04.2001 Original published format: US 681553 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1253291 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D5/20 (KR);
F01D5/225 (EP,US);
F01D5/082 (EP);
F05D2230/21 (EP,US);
F05D2240/81 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2003/30] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Turbinenschaufel mit gekühltem Deckbandelement | [2002/44] | English: | A turbine blade having a cooled tip shroud | [2002/44] | French: | Aube de turbine avec carénage d'extremité refroidi | [2002/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 09.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/31] | 25.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3017159 (TOM FOSTER, et al) [A] 3,5 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 10 * * column 5, line 8 - line 27 ** figures 2,13 *; | [X]US4127358 (PARKES ROGER J) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * column 2, line 20 - line 41 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US4312625 (PINAIRE LONNIE W) [A] 1-10 * figure 4 *; | [X]GB1605335 (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10 * page 2, line 58 - line 89 * * figures 3-5 *; | [X]US5460486 (EVANS NEIL M [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 29 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5531568 (BROADHEAD PETER [GB]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0935052 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0023] , [0024] , [0031] , [0051] * * figures 7,10 *; | [X]EP0940561 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6,8,9 * paragraphs [0019] , [0026] , [0027] * * figure 1A * |