EP1256318 - Adhesive for attaching buttress material to a surgical fastening device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON ENDO-SURGERY, INC. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45245 / US | [2002/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grant, Richard L. 4945 Nutmeg Knoll Cincinnati, Ohio 45244 / US | 02 /
Dalessandro, David 59 Helen Street Fanwood, New Jersey 07023 / US | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253133.9 | 03.05.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | US20010850369 | 07.05.2001 Original published format: US 850369 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1256318 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256318 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/00491 (EP,US);
A61B17/07292 (EP,US);
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00513 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/31] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kleber zur Befestigung von Verstärkungsmaterial an einem chirurgischen Klammergerät | [2004/22] | English: | Adhesive for attaching buttress material to a surgical fastening device | [2002/46] | French: | Adhésif pour attacher une pièce d'appui à une agraffeuse chirurgicale | [2002/46] |
Former [2002/46] | Kleber zur Befestigung von Verstärkungsmaterial an einem chirurgisches Klammergerät | Examination procedure | 23.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 03.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0577373 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 7 * * figure 4 *; | [DA]US5441193 (GRAVENER ROY D [US]) [DA] 1-5 * column 4, line 59 - line 68 ** figure 3 *; | [DA]EP0667119 (BIO VASCULAR INC [US]) [DA] 1-5 * column 6, line 12 - line 23 * * figure 2 *; | [DA]US5752965 (FRANCIS RALPH T [US], et al) [DA] 1-5 * column 7, line 1 - line 12 * * figures 1A,2A * | Examination | EP1064883 | by applicant | US5415334 | US5441193 | US5503638 | US5597107 | US5702409 | US5752965 | US5810855 | EP1064883 |