EP1256429 - Process for manufacturing granulated hydrophilic resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai-Ichi Kogyo Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 55 Nishi-shichijo, Higashi-kubocho, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8873 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states DAI-ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 55 Nishi-shichijo, Higashi-kubocho, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8873 / JP | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states DAI-ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO., LTD. 55 Nishi-shichijo, Higashi-kubocho, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8873 / JP | ||
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Dai-Ichi Kogyo Seiyaku Co., Ltd. 55 Higashi-Kubocho, Nishi-Shichijyo, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8873 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akao, Toshikazu Rokutandaso 6, 2 Katagihara Rokutanda Nishikyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, 615-8117 Kyoto / JP | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253165.1 | 07.05.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | JP20010138828 | 09.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001138828 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1256429 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256429 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29B9/04 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
B29B9/04 (EP,US);
C08J3/12 (KR);
B29K2071/02 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/34] |
Former [2003/31] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von granuliertem hydrophilen Harz | [2002/46] | English: | Process for manufacturing granulated hydrophilic resin | [2002/46] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de granulés de résine hydrophile | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 14.05.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.10.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.07.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4690788 (YADA AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1,10-12 * column 1, line 1 - line 25 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 26 * * example 4 * [A] 2-9; | [XA]US4734238 (SUGIMORI TERUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 60 - line 68 * * column 5, line 29 - line 41; figure 3 * [A] 2-4,11; | [XA]US3643874 (FRANZ PETER, et al) [X] 1,2,11 * column 1, line 47 - line 75 * * column 2, line 39 - line 46; figure 1 * [A] 3,4,7; | [A]US1583484 (MORRISON HARLEY J, et al) [A] 1,3,4,10,11 * page 1, line 19 - line 34 * * page 2, line 5 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [A]GB875140 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [A] 1-4,10,11 * page 1, line 37 - line 74 * * page 2, line 25 - line 57; figure 1 *; | [A]DD52798 (ERNST BULLACK) [A] 1,2,10-12 * column 1, line 15 - line 23 *; | [A]DE1222891 (KAISER GEB) [A] 1,3,4,10,11 * column 1, line 1 - line 13 * * column 3, line 11 - line 16 * * column 3, line 42 - line 52; figure 1 * |