EP1280040 - Centrally managed virus scanning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Networks Associates Technology, Inc. 3965 Freedom Circle Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states Networks Associates Technology Inc. 3965 Freedom Circle Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hinchliffe, Alexander James 13 Pettingrew Close, Walnut Tree Milton Keynes, Buckinghamshire MK7 7LL / GB | 02 /
Howard, Fraser Peter 49 Hill Cescent, Finstock Chipping Norton, Oxon OX7 3BT / GB | 03 /
Kemp, Andrew 46 Horspath Road, Cowley Oxford, Oxon OX4 2QT / GB | 04 /
Rai, Bobby 83 Station Road, Burton Latimer Kettering, Northants NN15 5BP / GB | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253235.2 | 09.05.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | US20010912392 | 26.07.2001 Original published format: US 912392 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1280040 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1280040 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
G06F21/567 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/51] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System zur zentralen Virenüberprüfung | [2003/05] | English: | Centrally managed virus scanning system | [2003/05] | French: | Système de détection de virus centralisé | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/25] | 18.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.11.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.11.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5960170 (CHEN EVA [US], et al) [X] 1,7,17,29,35,45,56,62,72 * abstract * * columns 1-10; figures 1-8 * * column 11, lines 1-55 * * columns 12-27 *; | [X]US6195587 (HRUSKA JAN [GB], et al) [X] 1-13,16-24,28-41,44-52,55-68,71-79,82 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-9; figure 3 * * column 2, lines 15-65; figures 1,2 * * column 3, lines 5-25,40-67 * * column 5, lines 1-60 * * column 4 *; | [X]EP1111507 (F SECURE OYJ [FI]) [X] 1,7,17,29,35,45,56,62,72 * the whole document *; | [A] - MARMELSTEIN R E ET AL, "A distributed architecture for an adaptive computer virus immune system", SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS, 1998. 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SAN DIEGO, CA, USA 11-14 OCT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19981011), ISBN 0-7803-4778-1, pages 3838 - 3843, XP010310923 [A] 14,15,25,26,42,43,53,54,69,70,80,81 * abstract * * page 3841 * * page 3842 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSMC.1998.726686 |