EP1256945 - Many-sided reflection prism and optical pickup [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-Dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do 441-370 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan 3-Dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do 441-370 / KR | ||
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-Dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 441-370 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Dae-sik 824-706 Wooseong Apt., 973-3 Youngtong-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Cho, Kun-ho 103-106 Doosan Donga Apt., 1199-1 Gwonseon-dong Gwonseon-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Hong, Soon-kyo 21-606 Hyundai Apt., 1436-1 Seocho 1-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | 04 /
Kim, Young-il 102-1404 Daejin 2-cha, 883-1 Jukjeon-ri Suji-eub, Yongin-shi, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Im, Kwang-sup (404) 1608-20 Bongcheon 7-dong Gwanak-gu, Seoul / KR | 06 /
Lee, Ho-cheol 419-1502 Poonglim Apt., 872-1 Jeongja-dong Jangan-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Kim, Dae-hwan 9-503 Sunkyung Apt., 506 Daechi 1-dong Gangnam-gu, Seoul / KR | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Clark, David James, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Clark, David James, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2002/46] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253263.4 | 09.05.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | KR20010026032 | 12.05.2001 Original published format: KR 2001026032 | KR20010061036 | 29.09.2001 Original published format: KR 2001061036 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256945 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256945 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256945 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135, G02B5/04 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
G11B7/1359 (EP,US);
G02B5/04 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/08] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vielflächiges Reflexionsprisma und optischer Abtastkopf | [2002/46] | English: | Many-sided reflection prism and optical pickup | [2002/46] | French: | Prisme à réflexion avec plusieurs surfaces latérales et tête de lecture optique | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH06302005 ; | [XY]JPH11134701 ; | [XY]JPH1116195 ; | [Y]JP2000298869 ; | [Y]US4333173 (YONEZAWA SEIJI, et al) [Y] 9 * figures 12,13 *; | [E]EP1255134 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1-8,10-15,21-30,37-46* the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06302005 A 19941028 (CANON INC) [X] 1-8,10-14 * abstract * [Y] 9,15-45 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11134701 A 19990521 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-8,10-14,28,29 * abstract * [Y] 9,15-27,30-45 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11016195 A 19990122 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,10-14 * abstract * [Y] 15-20 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000298869 A 20001024 (IND TECHNOL RES INST) [Y] 15-45 * abstract * |